EP1521414 - Method and apparatus for sphere decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yee, Mong Suan, c/o Toshiba Research Europe Ltd. 32 Queen Square Bristol BS1 4ND / GB | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255332.1 | 02.09.2004 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | GB20030023208 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0323208 | GB20040016823 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0416823 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1521414 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1521414 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H03M13/00 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H04L1/0631 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0048 (EP,US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H04L1/04 (EP,US);
H04L25/03242 (EP,US);
H04L25/067 (EP,US);
H04L27/38 (EP,US);
H04L2025/0342 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/52] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kugeldekodierung | [2005/14] | English: | Method and apparatus for sphere decoding | [2005/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de décodage par sphères | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 25.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2008 | Decision despatched | 24.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - VITERBO E ET AL, "A universal lattice code decoder for fading channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199907), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 1639 - 1642, XP002178307 [XD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.771234 | [DX] - HASSIBI B ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "On the expected complexity of sphere decoding", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 35TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 4 - 7, 2001, ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011104), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 35, ISBN 0-7803-7147-X, pages 1051 - 1055, XP010582204 [DX] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1052, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2001.987655 | [X] - DAMEN M O ET AL, "On maximum-likelihood detection and the search for the closest lattice point", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY IEEE USA, (20031001), vol. 49, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 2389 - 2402, XP002313805 [X] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2003.817444 |