EP1635015 - End fitting for a cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Technology, Inc. 2135 West Maple Drive Troy MI 48084 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham West Midlands, B30 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roussel, Jerome Pierre 23 rue de Thann, Appt.5 68000 Colmar / FR | 02 /
Carrington, Paul 9 Astley Avenue Halesowen, West Midlands B62 9TA / GB | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255441.0 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635015 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B53/00, F16C1/26 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
E05B79/20 (EP,US);
F16C1/106 (EP,US);
F16C1/16 (EP,US);
F16C1/262 (EP,US);
F16C2350/52 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20462 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelendbeschlag | [2006/11] | English: | End fitting for a cable | [2006/11] | French: | Embout pour extrémité de câble | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 16.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5615584 (IRISH ALLEN G [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * column 3, line 30 - line 45; figure . *; | [A]US6092436 (WIRSING TIMOTHY ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * column 2, line 39 - line 64; figure . *; | [A]FR2827650 (SILA HOLDING IND [IT]) [A] 1,10,12* page 7, line 30 - page 10, line 2; figure . *; | [XA]DE10227873 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 12 |