blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1517154

EP1517154 - Magnetic resonance imaging apparatus and magnetic resonance image producing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2008
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha
Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US
[2008/07]
Former [2005/12]For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard
Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Asono, Kenji
7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-8503 / JP
 [2005/12]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2005/12]Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date04255640.716.09.2004
[2005/12]
Priority number, dateJP2003032291816.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003322918
[2005/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1517154
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1517154
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2005
ClassificationIPC:G01R33/54
[2005/12]
CPC:
G01R33/4828 (EP,US); A61B5/055 (KR); G01R33/56563 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/50]
Former [2005/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kernspintomograph und Verfahren zur Erstellung eines Kernspinbildes[2005/12]
English:Magnetic resonance imaging apparatus and magnetic resonance image producing method[2005/12]
French:Appareil d'IRM et méthode de production d'une image de résonance magnétique[2005/12]
Examination procedure23.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/47]
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2007Fee for grant paid
20.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.09.2008
[2010/01]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0315443  ;
 [A]  - F. SCHICK ET AL., "Improved clinical echo-planar MRI using spatial-spectral excitation.", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (199807), vol. 8, ISSN 1053-1807, pages 960 - 967, XP008040957 [A] 1,2,5-9 * pages 961 - 964, paragraph "Materials and Methods" * * Figures 1 - 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910329), vol. 015, no. 132, Database accession no. (C - 0819), & JP03015443 A 19910123 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [DA]  - F. SCHICK ET AL., "HIGHLY SELECTIVE WATER AND FAT IMAGING APPLYING MULTISLICE SEQUENCES WITHOUT SENSITIVITY TO B1 FIELD INHOMOGENEITIES", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (199708), vol. 38, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 269 - 274, XP000695507 [DA] 1,2,5-9 *page 270: 1st paragraph - "A Multislice Spin-Echo Sequence" * * figures 1,2 *
 [DA]  - J. FORSTER ET AL., "Slice-selective fat saturation in MR angiography using spatial-spectral selective prepulses.", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING : JMRI. 1998 MAY-JUN, (199805), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 1053-1807, pages 583 - 589, XP008040952 [DA] 1,2,5-9 * pages 584 - 586: "Optimization of Spatial-Spectral Presaturation" * * Figures 2 and 3 *
 [A]  - Y. ZUR, "Design of improved spectral-spatial pulses for routine clinical use.", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (200003), vol. 43, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 410 - 420, XP002312165 [A] 1,9 * the whole text, figures 1, 4, 8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.