EP1521296 - Method of reclaiming silicon wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | For all designated states Kobe Precision Inc. 1510 Zephyr Avenue Hayward California 94544 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kobe Precision Inc. 1510 Zephyr Avenue Hayward, California 94544 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tetsuo, c/o Kobe Corporate Research Lab. in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5 Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
Takada, Satoru c/o Kobe Precision Inc. 1510 Zephyr Ave Hayward CA 94544 / US | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2005/14] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255729.8 | 21.09.2004 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | US20030677309 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 677309 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1521296 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1521296 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302, H01L21/306, H01L21/324 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H01L21/02032 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/3221 (EP,US);
H01L21/324 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/14] | H01L21/304, H01L21/306, H01L21/324 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Silizium-Plättchen | [2005/14] | English: | Method of reclaiming silicon wafers | [2005/14] | French: | Méthode de régénération de plaquettes de Silicium | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0964052 ; | [DA]US3923567 (LAWRENCE JOHN E) [DA] 1,3 * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 1, line 41 - line 48 * * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * * column 3, line 18 - line 52 * * column 4, line 6 - line 41 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 56; figures 1-5 ** column 7, line 32 - line 40 *; | [Y]US2001039101 (WENSKI GUIDO [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] * * page 5, line 11 - line 13 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]EP1205968 (PURE WAFER LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0004] *; | [PX]US2004063227 (SUZUKI TETSUO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09064052 A 19970307 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS SHILICON CORP; MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [DA] - ISTRATOV A A ET AL, "Intrinsic diffusion coefficient of interstitial copper in silicon", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS APS USA, (19980810), vol. 81, no. 6, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 1243 - 1246, XP002355224 [DA] 1 * page 1245; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.81.1243 |