EP1533676 - System and method for processing protected data with approved applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irwin, James Anthony Lar Cottage, 111 Lower End Leafield, Oxon OX29 9QG / GB | 02 /
Mudie, George Stronach 2 Lawrences Lane Thatcham RG18 3LF / GB | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Harries, Simon George, et al Vodafone Group Services Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Harries, Simon George, et al Vodafone Group Services Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Foster, Mark Charles Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256091.2 | 01.10.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | GB20030023688 | 09.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0323688 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533676 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L9/32 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Methode zur Verarbeitung von geschützten Daten durch anerkannte Anwendungen | [2005/21] | English: | System and method for processing protected data with approved applications | [2005/21] | French: | Système et procédé de traitement des données protegées par des applications approuvées | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 04.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/31] | 18.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5991399 (GRAUNKE GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1083480 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,11 * column 3, paragraph 14 - column 4, paragraph 22 *; | [X]US2002007456 (PEINADO MARCUS [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * figures 1,5A,12,13 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0104] , [0115] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0291] - paragraph [0295] *; | [A]WO02077780 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2003120667 (JEONG YEON JEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |