EP1523152 - Connector gateway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Geschäftshaus Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corneille, Kevin R. 605 5th Avenue South Seattle, Washington 98104 / US | 02 /
Sherwin, John D. 605 5th Avenue South Seattle, Washington 98104 / US | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/15] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256199.3 | 07.10.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | US20030680661 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: US 680661 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1523152 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1523152 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1523152 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/4523 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04W12/082 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04Q7/20 | ||
Former IPC [2005/15] | H04L29/06, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindunggateway | [2005/15] | English: | Connector gateway | [2005/15] | French: | Passerelle de connection | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2004 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | LU | 07.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.10.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 07.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.10.2004 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 07.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 07.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0899925 (ATCOM INC [US]) [Y] 2,14 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] *; | [XY]US2002069278 (FORSLOEW JAN [SE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,12,13,15-18,20,21,23-26 * paragraphs [0036] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0093] , [0099] - [0104] * * paragraphs [0106] , [0107] , [0110] * * paragraphs [0112] , [0126] , [0128] * * paragraphs [0130] , [0131] , [0133] * * paragraphs [0135] - [0137] * [Y] 2,5,8-11,14,19,22,27,28; | [XY]US6606708 (DEVINE CAROL Y [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12,15-18,23-26 * column 2, lines 56-60 * * column 3, lines 18-43 * * column 8, lines 22-35 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 10 * * column 10, lines 9-27 * * column 13, line 60 - column 14, line 32 * * column 22, line 18 - column 23, line 3 * * column 24, lines 60-65 * [Y] 5,8-11,19,22,27,28; | [A] - MURTHY U ET AL, "Firewalls for security in wireless networks", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 1998., PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRTY-FIRST HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KOHALA COAST, HI, USA 6-9 JAN. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980106), vol. 7, ISBN 0-8186-8255-8, pages 672 - 680, XP010262834 [A] 1-28 * chapter 2.2.1 "Components and configuration"; page 674, column R - page 675, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HICSS.1998.649269 | [A] - HUNT R, "Internet/Intranet firewall security-policy, architecture and transaction services", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, BUTTERWORTHS & CO. PUBLISHERS LTD, GB, (19980901), vol. 21, no. 13, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 1107 - 1123, XP004146571 [A] 1-28 * chapter 2 "firewall architecture"; page 1110, column R - page 1117, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(98)00173-X |