EP1524647 - Polarity inversion method for active matrix display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joo, Soong-Yong 404-1303 Jugong 4danji Apt. Gumi-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Maeng, Ho-Suk 106-1802 Bangbae Hyundai Apt. Bangbae 4-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256258.7 | 08.10.2004 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | KR20030071041 | 13.10.2003 Original published format: KR 2003071041 | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1524647 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1524647 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G2310/0297 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G3/3614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polaritätsumkehrungsverfahren für eine Anzeigevorrichtung mit aktiver Matrix | [2005/16] | English: | Polarity inversion method for active matrix display apparatus | [2005/16] | French: | Procédé d'inversion de polarité pour un dispositif d'affichage à matrice active | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003090450 (INADA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document ** paragraphs [0037] - [0073]; figures 4,6-11 * |