EP1555646 - Display apparatuses and display driving methods for enhancing grayscale display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | [2008/39] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Ayahito Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Shinsuke Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Oota, Shunji Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256589.5 | 26.10.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | JP20040007033 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004007033 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555646 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
G09G3/293 (EP,US);
G09G3/291 (KR);
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/2037 (EP,US);
G09G3/2927 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G2320/0271 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/15] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Graustufenanzeige | [2005/29] | English: | Display apparatuses and display driving methods for enhancing grayscale display | [2005/29] | French: | Dispositifs de visualisation et procédés de commande d'affichage permettant d'améliorer affichage de l'echelle des gris | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0811963 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-3,8-10,14-18,23-25,29,30 * column 7, lines 11-30; figures 9,11 * * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 28 *; | [X]EP1174850 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0021] - [0033] - [0045] - [0047] *; | [X]EP1199701 (FUJITSU HITACHI PLASMA DISPLAY [JP]) [X] 1-7,14-22,29,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0047] - [0053] - [0057] - [0077] , [0079] , [0081] , [0082] *; | [A]WO02101704 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1418563 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0008] - [0010] - [0013] , [0042] - [0056] * | Examination | US2002130825 |