EP1637768 - Flex accommodating cable terminations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bright Technologies LLC 4082 Forsythe Way Tallahassee, Florida 32309 / US | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Richard V. 4082 Forsythe Way Tallahassee, Florida 32309 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256680.2 | 28.10.2004 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | US20040946283 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: US 946283 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1637768 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1637768 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
F16G11/042 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3907 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3909 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3916 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3969 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | Biegung angepasste Seilendstücke | [2006/12] | English: | Flex accommodating cable terminations | [2006/12] | French: | Terminaisons de câble adaptées à la flexion | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2004 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04258403 ; | [A]FR1376395 (LAGARDE) [A] 1,3* page 3, line 47 - line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]FR1447862 (PAVLIC) [X] 1,4,11-14 * page 1, column R, line 29 - page 2, column L, line 50; figures 1-3 * [A] 3; | [Y]DE19546244 (VER DRAHTSEILWERKE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5718532 (MOWER TODD M [US]) [A] 1,3,6,7 * column 1, line 31 - line 43 * * column 4, line 53 - line 61; figures 1B,4B * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 038, Database accession no. (M - 1358), & JP04258403 A 19920914 (SHINKO KOSEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,4-7,16,17 * abstract * |