EP1655693 - HANDHELD ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING APPOINTMENT AND MEETING CONFLICT NOTIFICATION, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/19] | Handheld electronic device including appointment and meeting conflict notification, and associated method | ||
[2015/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bocking, Andrew D 547 Mariner Drive Waterloo, Ontario, N2K 3Y8 / CA | 02 /
May, Darrell R. 453 Lake Louise Blvd. Waterloo, Ontario, N2V 2K6 / CA | 03 /
Hardy, Michael T. 559 Paradise Crescent Waterloo, Ontario, N2T 2J8 / CA | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04256786.7 | 03.11.2004 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655693 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655693 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/19] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 10.11.2006 | HR | 10.11.2006 | LT | 10.11.2006 | LV | 10.11.2006 | MK | 10.11.2006 | YU | 10.11.2006 | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON TERMINKONFLIKTEN | [2015/22] | English: | HANDHELD ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING APPOINTMENT AND MEETING CONFLICT NOTIFICATION, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2015/22] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTATIF ET MÉTHODE ASSOCIÉE DE NOTIFICATION DE CONFLITS DE RENDEZ-VOUS | [2015/22] |
Former [2006/19] | Tragbares elektronisches Gerät und zugehöriges Verfahren zur Anzeige von Terminkonflikten | ||
Former [2006/19] | Handheld electronic device including appointment and meeting conflict notification, and associated method | ||
Former [2006/19] | Appareil électronique portatif et méthode associée de notification de conflits de rendez-vous | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 09.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.01.2010 | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 09.12.2009 | Appeal received No. T0117/10 | 09.12.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 25.05.2006 | Appeal received No. T1265/06 | 04.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2004 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | IE | 03.11.2015 | LU | 03.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
GR | 17.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5761525 (WILLIAMS MARVIN L [US]) [X] 1-18 * column 1, lines 52-55 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]US5774867 (FITZPATRICK GREGORY P [US], et al) [A] 2,10 * abstract ** column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 67; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2001054072 (DISCOLO ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0088] - [0096]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0099] *; | [X]US2002154178 (BARNETT THEODORE H [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0062]; figures 1,1a * * paragraphs [0091] - [0095]; figure 15 * * paragraphs [0113] - [0115]; figure 11 * * paragraphs [0122] - [0126]; figures 13,14 * * paragraphs [0288] - [0290] - [0295] *; | [A]US2003103415 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] * |