blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1530264

EP1530264 - Socket contact [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2012
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2012  [2012/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd.
4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka, 542-0081 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd.
4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka, 542-0081 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aramoto, Kiyoshi, J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd
Osaka Engin. Ctr, 9-23, Takejima 3-chome
Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
02 / Sano, Koji, J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd
Osaka Engin. Center, 9-23, Takejima 3-chome
Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
03 / Matsuno, Toshiaki, J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd
Osaka Engin. Ctr, 9-23, Takejima 3-chome
Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)DeVile, Jonathan Mark
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr.
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date04256877.405.11.2004
[2005/19]
Priority number, dateJP2003037919907.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003379199
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1530264
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1530264
Date:08.02.2006
[2006/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/10
[2005/19]
CPC:
H01R13/112 (EP,US); H01R13/11 (KR); H01R4/24 (KR);
H01R4/2454 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/41]
Former [2005/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontakthülse[2005/19]
English:Socket contact[2005/19]
French:Prise de contact[2005/19]
Examination procedure09.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
09.08.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.11.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/42]
29.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.09.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006IS   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2674378  (AMP FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 6, line 8 - line 25 *;
 [Y]DE19525241  (WECO WESTER EBBINGHAUS & CO [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 55 - line 68 *;
 [Y]US5556285  (ONO HISAHIRO [JP]) [Y] 5* abstract *;
 [Y]EP0854543  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * column 4, line 17 - column 8, line 10 *;
 [Y]DE19828983  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.