Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006140452 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04257808 | 15.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1672460 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B1 | EP1672460 | 21.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04257808 | 15.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004024322D1 | 07.01.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04257808 | 15.12.2004 |