blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1543850

EP1543850 - Activatable bioactive implantable vascular occlusion device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/25]Activatable bioactive implantable medical device
[2012/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Codman & Shurtleff, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, MA 02767 / US
[2012/38]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.
14000 N.W. 57th Court Miami Lakes
Florida 33014 / US
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
Cordis Neurovascular, Inc.
14000 N.W. 57th Court
Miami Lakes, Florida 33014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jones, Donald K.
4945 N.W. 82nd Terrace
Lauderhill Florida 33351 / US
02 / Lorenzo, Juan A.
3650 S.W. 106 Terrace
Davie Florida 33328 / US
03 / Pomeranz, Mark L.
11980 Piccadilly Place
Davie Florida 33325 / US
04 / Sherman, Darren
1216 S.E. 5th Court, Ft.
Lauderdale Florida 33301 / US
 [2005/25]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2005/25]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date04257861.716.12.2004
[2005/25]
Priority number, dateUS2003073847717.12.2003         Original published format: US 738477
US2004086815215.06.2004         Original published format: US 868152
[2005/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1543850
Date:22.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1543850
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61L31/10, A61L31/16, A61B17/12
[2005/25]
CPC:
A61L31/16 (EP); A61B17/12022 (EP); A61B17/12113 (EP);
A61B17/1215 (EP); A61B17/1219 (EP); A61L31/10 (EP);
A61B2017/00831 (EP); A61B2017/00893 (EP); A61B2017/00898 (EP);
A61B2017/12054 (EP); A61L2300/216 (EP); A61L2430/36 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2006/11]
Former [2005/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aktivierbare bioaktive implantierbare Gefässokklusionsvorrichtung[2012/03]
English:Activatable bioactive implantable vascular occlusion device[2012/03]
French:Dispositif d'occlusion vasculaire bioactif et implantable pouvant être activé[2012/03]
Former [2005/25]Aktivierbare bioaktive implantierbare medizinische Vorrichtung
Former [2005/25]Activatable bioactive implantable medical device
Former [2005/25]Dispositif médical bioactif et implantable pouvant être activé
Examination procedure01.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/05]
25.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2012Fee for grant paid
04.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2008
Opposition(s)12.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0040278  (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * page 14, line 3 - page 17, line 23 * * page 21, line 6 - line 12 * * claim - * [Y] 1-10;
 [DY]US6299619  (GREENE JR GEORGE R [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 37 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 11 * * claim - *;
 [Y]US2002123801  (PACETTI STEPHEN D [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0063] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0122] ** paragraph [0128] *;
 [X]WO03064383  (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7-10 * page 57, line 7 - line 29 * * page 62, line 15 - line 42 * * page 67, line 34 - line 44 *;
 [Y]US2003171770  (KUSLEIKA RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0051] *;
 [X]WO03092791  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7-10 * page 1, line 10 - line 17 * * page 4, line 6 - line 21 * * page 8, line 24 - line 33 * * page 15, line 33 - line 34 * * claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.