EP1672020 - Polyethylene composition for artificial turf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovene Manufacturing Belgium NV Scheldelaan 482 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Innovene Europe Limited European Patents Group Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road, Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Innovene Europe Limited European Patents Group Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257962.3 | 20.12.2004 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672020 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
D01F1/04 (EP);
C08L23/04 (EP);
D01F6/46 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L2666/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polyethylenmassen für Kunstwiese | [2006/25] | English: | Polyethylene composition for artificial turf | [2006/25] | French: | Composition à base de polyéthylène pour gazon artificiel | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2006/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5721425 ; | [A]JPH06184811 ; | [A]US3418270 (TRAUB RICHARD K) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US4369267 (KEUNG CHUE-KWOK J [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]WO03059618 (INTERTAPE POLYMER GROUP [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 34 * * page 7, paragraphs 36,38 * * page 9, paragraphs 45,47 * * page 13, paragraph 64 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820527), vol. 006, no. 090, Database accession no. (C - 104), & JP57021425 A 19820204 (DAINICHI SEIKA KOGYO KK) [X] 6,7 * abstract * [Y] 1-10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941011), vol. 018, no. 533, Database accession no. (C - 1259), & JP06184811 A 19940705 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |