EP1550408 - Curved cutter stapler shaped for surgical operations for the male pelvis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, William 4886 Elizabeth Court Mason Ohio 45040 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04258156.1 | 29.12.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | US20030532912P | 30.12.2003 Original published format: US 532912 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550408 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2946 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Gekrümmtes Schneide-Klammer-Gerät für chirurgische Operationen am männlichen Becken | [2005/27] | English: | Curved cutter stapler shaped for surgical operations for the male pelvis | [2005/27] | French: | Agrafeuse coupante incurvée pour des opérations chirurgicales au pelvis masculin | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2011 | 21.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/32] | 02.04.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5972023 (TANNER HOWARD MILES [US], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]WO0191646 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY EUROPE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 24 - line 28; figure - * |