EP1441155 - Command device for a gearbox allowing a faster speed change and method to shift into the associated gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wascheul, Michael 5, rue Pierre Sémard 78260 Acheres / FR | 02 /
Gabucci, Stéphane 109 avenue du Général Leclerc 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290148.8 | 20.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | FR20030000673 | 22.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300673 | FR20030011200 | 24.09.2003 Original published format: FR 0311200 | [2004/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441155 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441155 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/28 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
F16H63/20 (EP);
F16H61/28 (EP);
F16H61/32 (EP);
F16H2059/0295 (EP);
F16H2063/3089 (EP);
F16H63/3408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für ein Schaltgetriebe zum schnelleren Schalten, mit dem zugehörigen Schaltverfahren | [2004/31] | English: | Command device for a gearbox allowing a faster speed change and method to shift into the associated gear | [2004/31] | French: | Dispositif de commande de boîte de vitesses permettant un changement de rapport accéléré, et méthode de changement de rapport associé | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2007 | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | IE | 14.03.2007 | NL | 14.03.2007 | RO | 14.03.2007 | SI | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | HU | 15.09.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
HU | 15.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
RO | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IE | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
NL | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0652391 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * figures 5-9 *; | [A]EP0695892 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5970815 (BUERGER HANS [DE]) [A] 5-8* figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US6003649 (FISCHER ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * figures 26A,26B * * figures 5,10,28 * * column 29, line 19 - column 30, line 9 * * column 1, line 34 - line 63 * * column 2, line 1 - line 38 * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]DE10052935 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [Y] 5-8 * figure 1 * |