EP1443620 - System for modifying the structure of an electrical harness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABINAL 9, avenue Franklin 78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunand, Michel 12 rue Paul Sabatier 31130 Balma / FR | 02 /
Guerrero, Sébastien 385 chemin de Laurensou 31620 Fronton / FR | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290176.9 | 23.01.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | FR20030000968 | 29.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300968 | [2004/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1443620 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1443620 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
H02G3/0468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, TR [2005/17] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Ändern der Struktur eines elektrischen Kabelbaumes | [2004/32] | English: | System for modifying the structure of an electrical harness | [2004/32] | French: | Système de modification de la structure d'un harnais électrique | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5091604 (KIRMA SAFA [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5126507 (KIRMA SAFA [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002179318 (SEO HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * |