EP1449984 - Discharging means for a concrete bucket and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/35] | Discharging means for a concrete bucket | ||
[2007/50] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SECATOL 94 Route de Ligugé 86280 Saint Benoit / FR | [2008/03] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Société d'Etude et Construction d'Application de la Tolerie "SECATOL" SA 94, Route de Ligugé 86280 Saint Benoit / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilles, Yves-Noel 2, rue Jacques Cartier 86280 Saint Benoit / FR | 02 /
Gilles, Claude Rue du Château 86240 Iteuil / FR | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Degret, Jacques, et al Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux 75017 Paris / FR | [2008/03] |
Former [2004/35] | Degret, Jacques Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290294.0 | 04.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | FR20030002201 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302201 | [2004/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449984 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449984 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/02 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
E04G21/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Auslassvorrichtung für einen Betonkübel and ihr Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/50] | English: | Discharging means for a concrete bucket and its manufacturing process | [2007/50] | French: | Dispositif de vidage de benne à béton et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/50] |
Former [2004/35] | Auslassvorrichtung für einen Betonkübel | ||
Former [2004/35] | Discharging means for a concrete bucket | ||
Former [2004/35] | Dispositif de vidage de benne à béton | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Observations by third parties | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Florian Eichinger GmbH An der Lände 10 92360 Mühlhausen / DE Opponent's representative Preuss, Udo Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Florian Eichinger GmbH Baugerätefabrik An der Lände 10 92360 Mühlhausen / DE Opponent's representative Preuss, Udo Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | 20.03.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.01.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/18] | Appeal following opposition | 20.01.2011 | Appeal received No. T0201/11 | 04.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.01.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 24.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3146924 (COZADD RAYMOND B, et al) [DA] * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 55; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2012787 (ITAS) [A] * page 1 *; | [DA]FR2542028 (SECATOL SA [FR]) [DA] * figure . *; | [DA]FR2590306 (GILLES AUGUSTE [FR]) [DA] 1,12 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 69; figure - *; | [DA]FR2607853 (GILLES AUGUSTE [FR]) [DA] * figure . *; | [DA]FR2637834 (GILLES AUGUSTE [FR]) [DA] 1,12 * page 3; figure -; claims 1,3 * |