EP1449730 - Parking brake manual control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT AGRICULTURE 7, Rue Dewoitine 78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charmant, Jérôme 29 rue Saint Exupéry 92360 Meudon la Foret / FR | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Rougemont, Bernard, et al Renault Technocentre Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1 Avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Rougemont, Bernard, et al Renault s.a.s, S. 0267 TCR AVA 056 1, avenue du Golf F-78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290310.4 | 06.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | FR20030002148 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302148 | [2004/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449730 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/10, B60T17/22 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B60T7/105 (EP);
B60T17/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/20] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Handfeststellbremsbetätigungsanordnung | [2004/35] | English: | Parking brake manual control | [2004/35] | French: | Dispositif de commande manuelle de frein de parking | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4149433 (SCHROTER HANS O) [Y] 4-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5065643 (AXTELL LLOYD L [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US6189644 (TAYLOR STEVEN C [US]) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [XY]DE10029750 (EDSCHA AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 4-8; | [A]DE10026006 (DIETZ METALL [DE]) [A] 8* abstract * |