EP1470811 - Composition comprising a dispersion of polymer particles and an ester of a carboxylic acid with a polyol for pigment dispersion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blin, Xavier 24, rue de Staël 75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lebre, Caroline 6 place Van Gogh 94320 Thiais / FR | [2006/15] |
Former [2004/44] | 01 /
Blin, Xavier 24, rue de Sta l 75015 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Lebre, Caroline 6 place Van Gogh 94320 Thiais / FR | Representative(s) | Allab, Myriam L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Allab, Myriam L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290463.1 | 20.02.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | FR20030050034 | 25.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0350034 | [2004/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470811 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470811 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q1/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/90 (EP);
H02G9/10 (KR);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61Q1/06 (EP);
E02D29/121 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | A61K7/025, A61K7/48, A61K7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein Polymerdispersion und eine Polyol-Säureester zur Dispergierung von Pigmenten | [2004/44] | English: | Composition comprising a dispersion of polymer particles and an ester of a carboxylic acid with a polyol for pigment dispersion | [2004/44] | French: | Composition cosmétique comprenant une dispersion de particules de polymère et un ester d'acide et de polyole dispersion de pigments | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | CY | 03.05.2006 | CZ | 03.05.2006 | EE | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | RO | 03.05.2006 | SI | 03.05.2006 | SK | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | BG | 03.08.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | HU | 04.11.2006 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CY | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
TR | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
HU | 04.11.2006 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CY | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
RO | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 03.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1044673 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,6,9,12-21,40-44,46,47 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]FR2794970 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,12-47* claims 1,11 *; | [DA]EP1249223 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1,12-47 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1262164 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,12-47 * page 9, line 12 - line 29 *; | [E]WO2004028490 (OREAL [FR], et al) [E] 1,6,9,12-21,40-44,46,47 * page 42; example 2 * * claim - * |