EP1569489 - Method for automatic generation of telecommunication terminal active profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78 Rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atheo, Stéphane 28, rue des Garennes 44810 Heric / FR | 02 /
Guillouard, Karine 10, rue de Champagne 35135 Chantepie / FR | 03 /
Bonnin, Jean-Marie 2, rue de Châteaubriant 35150 Corps Nuds / FR | 04 /
Suciu, Lucian 3, rue de la Chataigneraie Studio 235 35510 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 05 /
Stevant, Bruno 51, Square Pedro Flores 35700 Rennes / FR | [2019/52] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
Atheo, Stéphane 28, rue des Garennes 44810 Heric / FR | ||
02 /
Guillouard, Karine 10, rue de Champagne 35135 Chantepie / FR | |||
03 /
Bonnin, Jean-Marie 2, rue de Châteaubriant 35150 Corps Nuds / FR | |||
04 /
Suciu, Lucian 3, rue de la Chataignerie Studio 235 35510 Cesson Sévigné / FR | |||
05 /
Stevant, Bruno 51, Square Pedro Flores 35700 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/35] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290528.1 | 26.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569489 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569489 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, H04M1/725, // H04W8/22 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04M1/72448 (EP);
H04W8/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2006/20] | |||
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Erzeugung von aktiven Profilen für ein Telekommunikationsendgerät | [2005/35] | English: | Method for automatic generation of telecommunication terminal active profiles | [2005/35] | French: | Procédé de génération automatique de profils actifs pour terminal de télécommunications | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2004 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | IE | 26.02.2020 | LU | 26.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2020 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2020 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.02.2020 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6088732 (SMITH ALAN P [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 17 - line 57 * * column 5, line 41 - column 8, line 67 * * column 9, line 18 - column 16, line 67 *; | [YA]US6105063 (HAYES JR KENT FILLMORE [US]) [Y] 4-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 19 * * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 28 - line 61 * * column 5, line 51 - column 11, line 27 * * figure 3 * [A] 1,2,8-10; | [XY]US2003100308 (RUSCH LESLIE A [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraph 14 - paragraph 17 * * page 3, paragraph 20 - page 4, paragraph 31 * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]US2003119515 (HOLLER JAN [SE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 9 * * page 2, paragraph 15 - page 3, paragraph 30 *; | [A]WO03073782 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 7 - line 13 * * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 32 ** page 9, line 17 - page 15, line 25 *; | [A] - 3GPP, "Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Service requirement for the 3GPP Generic User Profile (GUP); Stage 1", 3GPP TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, (200401), XP002289948 [A] 1,2,4-10 * page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 25 * * page 10, line 1 - page 15, line 15 * * page 19, line 13 - page 20, line 18 * * page 22, line 7 - line 21 * |