EP1462885 - Drift compensation system for a watch in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fromion, Alexandre 6 rue Marin La Meslée 92160 Antony / FR | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/37] |
Former [2004/40] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290549.7 | 01.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | FR20030003653 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303653 | [2004/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462885 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G04G3/02 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G04G3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Driftkompensationsverfahren für eine Uhr in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/40] | English: | Drift compensation system for a watch in a motor vehicle | [2004/40] | French: | Système de compensation des dérivés d'une horloge pour véhicule automobile | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4448543 (VAIL DAVID K [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 61 *; | [A]US5848355 (RASOR GREGG EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 7-25 *; | [Y]US5940027 (FORSETH DANIEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 64 *; | [A]US6081163 (UJIIE HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* column 5, line 51 - column 9, line 17 *; | [Y]WO0188635 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 28 * |