EP1571390 - Double wall tank with magnetic suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schippl, Klaus Rischkamp 60 30659 Hannover / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04290556.2 | 01.03.2004 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571390 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571390 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F17C3/08, F17C13/06 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
F17C13/06 (EP,KR,US);
F17C3/08 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/0128 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/014 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/017 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/018 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/0304 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/0391 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/0629 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2203/0639 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0305 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0308 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2209/221 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2227/0339 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Doppelwandiger Behälter mit magnetischer Aufhängung | [2005/36] | English: | Double wall tank with magnetic suspension | [2005/36] | French: | Réservoir à double paroi et suspension magnétique | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | EE | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | IE | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | PL | 29.11.2006 | RO | 29.11.2006 | SI | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | BG | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | AT | 01.03.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | LU | 01.03.2007 | ES | 12.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | HU | 30.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 29.11.2006 | |
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
AT | 01.03.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
LU | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
AT | 01.03.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
AT | 01.03.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
PL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2025029 (BOC LTD); | [A]US4750631 (HASTINGS ROGER N [US], et al); | [A]DE4418745 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |