25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
05.10.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
27.10.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
06.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.06.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.04.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
22.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|