18.09.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.10.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.10.2014 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.04.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
13.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.04.2010 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
08.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
04.08.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
04.08.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
04.08.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
14.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
27.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |