Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7608301 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2009 | B2 | US2004194858 | 07.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4695848B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | B2 | JP2004308010 | 04.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1466996 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2014 | B1 | EP1466996 | 06.09.2006 | A3 | EP1466996 | 13.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2461406 | 15.11.2011 | C | CA2461406 | 02.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2853329 | 14.07.2006 | B1 | FR2853329 | 08.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2350685 | 27.03.2009 | C2 | RU2004110000 | 20.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0304104 | 02.04.2003 |