EP1471135 - Composition for Radioactive Decontamination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salvarem La Fosse Yvon 50440 Beaumont Hague / FR | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarraf, Riad 2, Allée Guynemer 93330 Neuilly sur Marne / FR | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/44] | Geismar, Thierry Bouju Derambure Bugnion - BDSA, 18 Quai du Point du Jour 92659 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290826.9 | 29.03.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | FR20030003885 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303885 | [2004/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471135 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471135 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/00, G21F9/30 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G21F9/30 (EP);
C11D1/825 (EP);
C11D3/48 (EP);
C11D1/662 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Radioaktiven Dekontamination | [2004/44] | English: | Composition for Radioactive Decontamination | [2004/44] | French: | Composition de décontamination radioactive | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | LU | 29.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 29.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 29.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2539928 (BOSSERT EDUARD) [X] 1 * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [XY]US4129514 (CAFFAREL JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-13; | [YA]EP0342043 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 3 * page 6, lines 30-65 *[A] 1,2,4-14; | [Y]FR2763595 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [Y] 3 * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 10; claims 1-10 *; | [XY]US6046152 (VINSON PHILLIP KYLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 31, line 60 - column 33, line 29 * [Y] 4-13; | [XY]US6087309 (VINSON PHILLIP KYLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 32, line 22 - column 44, line 67 * [Y] 4-13 |