25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
19.10.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
10.11.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
10.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
10.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
05.09.2006 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.09.2006 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
01.09.2006 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
13.04.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
13.05.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
15.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |