EP1464323 - Fluorescent dye composition for human keratin fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gourlaouen, Luc 3, rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau 92600 Asnieres / FR | 02 /
Plos, Grégory 5 passage du Chemin Vert 75011 Paris / FR | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Wattremez, Catherine L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Wattremez, Catherine L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290865.7 | 01.04.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | FR20030004023 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: FR 0304023 | [2004/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464323 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464323 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/10, A61Q19/02, A61K8/49 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
A61Q19/02 (EP);
A61K8/4926 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K2800/434 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | A61K7/13, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Fluoreszenzfarbstoffzusammensetzung zum Färben von menschlichen Keratinfasern | [2004/41] | English: | Fluorescent dye composition for human keratin fibres | [2004/41] | French: | Composition de coloration pour matières kératiniques humaines comprenant un colorant fluorescent | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 28.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Request for further processing for: | 09.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | CZ | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | EE | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | IT | 13.12.2006 | NL | 13.12.2006 | PL | 13.12.2006 | RO | 13.12.2006 | SI | 13.12.2006 | SK | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | BG | 13.03.2007 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | LU | 01.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | HU | 14.06.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CY | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
LU | 01.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
PL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001294519 ; | [A]FR2613221 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1,6-14,19-24,26,27,31,32 * claims 1,8,18 *; | [A]CA1255603 (COSMEPRO INC LAB) [A] 1-5,13,14,18,21-24,27-32 * claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP0370470 (ESTEE LAUDER INC [US]) [A] 1-3,5,15-18,21-25,27-29,31,32 * claims 1,9 *; | [A]WO9906016 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,9-14,19-24,26,27,31,32* abstract *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 14, Database accession no. 2002-100586, XP002262381 & JP2001294519 A 20011023 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-3,5,15-18,21-24,27-29,31,32 * abstract * |