EP1473410 - Device for realising a roadsurface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLAS 7, Place René Clair 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states COLAS 7 place René Clair 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tessonneau, Hervé 27 Chemin du Bois de Serres 69570 Dardilly / FR | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291148.7 | 03.05.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | FR20030005426 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0305426 | [2004/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473410 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/21 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
E01C19/21 (EP);
E01C19/4813 (EP);
E01C2019/2075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DK, GB, LI [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erstellen eines Strassenbelags | [2004/45] | English: | Device for realising a roadsurface | [2004/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la réalisation d'un revêtement routier | [2005/25] |
Former [2004/45] | Dispositif pour la réalisation d'un revetement routier | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2626907 (SECMAIR SA [FR]) [A] 1,15,17* the whole document *; | [A]US2002190138 (TERRY PHILLIP RAND [US]) [A] 1,7,15,17 * column W * |