EP1484672 - Method and system for transmission of aircraft information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS (SAS) 316 route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states AIRBUS FRANCE 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Denys Au Village 31480 Pelleport / FR | 02 /
Fernandez-Ramos, Yvan Rés. Le Montesquieu Bat. A Apt. 36 2 Rue de Montesquieu 31200 Toulouse / FR | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291193.3 | 10.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | FR20030006733 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: FR 0306733 | [2004/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484672 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04L29/06 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G09G2330/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Ubertragung von Luftfahrzeuginformationen | [2004/50] | English: | Method and system for transmission of aircraft information | [2004/50] | French: | Procédé et système de transmission d'information sur un aéronef | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5768528 (STUMM CHRISTIAN [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 8 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 39 *; | [A]US6442571 (HAFF MAURICE W [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 28, line 50 - column 28, line 62 *; | [A] - MCCARTNEY R ET AL, "An ARINC D-Size, liquid crystal display for aircraft primary flight instruments", DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 1994. 13TH DASC., AIAA/IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 30 OCT.-3 NOV. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19941030), ISBN 0-7803-2425-0, pages 620 - 625, XP010127068 [A] 1,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DASC.1994.369412 |