EP1478157 - Method and apparatus for session control. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costantinof, Cristian 13 Foxleigh Kanata, Ontario K2M 1B4 / CA | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291218.8 | 12.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | US20030439531 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 439531 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478157 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H04L47/122 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/2416 (EP,US);
H04L47/266 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/746 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M3/36 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0091 (EP,US);
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/31] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sitzungssteuerung | [2004/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for session control. | [2004/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande de session | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 18.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.09.2008 | 27.08.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/48] | 15.09.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0841825 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,8,11,15,18,19,26,29,33,36 * page 2, line 24 ** page 3, line 37 - line 57 *; | [XA]WO0186972 (SS8 NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11-14,18-27,29-32,36-40 * figures 1,12 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * [A] 10,15-17,28,33-35; | [XA]US2002052962 (CHERKASOVA LUDMILA [US], et al) [X] 1,8-19,26-36 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0046] * [A] 5 | Examination | US6119143 |