Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7108224 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2006 | B2 | US2004251380 | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004352232 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1481897 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2005 | B1 | EP1481897 | 01.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0401810 | 18.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2469871 | 27.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004000113T | 29.06.2006 | T2 | DE602004000113D1 | 10.11.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2250955T | 16.04.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2855496 | 22.09.2006 | B1 | FR2855496 | 03.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2004116116 | 10.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0306437 | 27.05.2003 |