19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
04.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
14.01.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
17.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
19.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
08.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
05.02.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
05.02.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.10.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2008 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.01.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.01.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.10.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.10.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
03.06.2005 |
First examination report |
|
01.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
15.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |