EP1566941 - Method and device for enabling mono- and bi-directional communication between mobile equipment and smartcard applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rangoni, Gabriel c/o Axalto SA Intellectual Property Department 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2005/34] | Application number, filing date | 04291483.8 | 11.06.2004 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | EP20040290447 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04290447 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566941 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G06K7/10297 (EP);
G06K19/0719 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/20] |
Former [2005/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung für das Ermöglichen von mono- und bidirektionaler Kommunikation Mobilteil- und Smartcardanwendungen | [2005/34] | English: | Method and device for enabling mono- and bi-directional communication between mobile equipment and smartcard applications | [2005/34] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour permettre la communication mono- et bi-directionnelle entre l'équipement mobile et les applications de smartcard | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002199027 (HUBER ADRIANO [CH]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US6671522 (BEAUDOU M PATRICE [FR]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 4, line 42 * * column 6, line 40 - line 51 ** column 7, line 31 - line 41 *; | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); GSM API for SIM toolkit stage 2 (3GPP TS 03.19 version 8.5.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 101 476", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200209), vol. 3-T3;SMG9, no. V850, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014006397 [A] 1-6 * Chapters 4-6 * | [A] - ISO, 7816 part 4: Interindustry command for interchange, (19950901), XP002169265 [A] 1,4 * Chapters 5., 6. and 9. * | [A] - ZHIQUN CHEN ET AL, Understanding Java Card 2.0, (199803), XP002146332 [A] 4 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Specification of the Subscriber Identity Module - Mobile Equipment (SIM - ME) interface (GSM 11.11 version 8.3.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 100 977", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200008), vol. 3-T3;SMG9, no. V830, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014005891 [A] 1,5 * Chapters 6, 8, 9 * |