EP1496601 - Braking system with secured transfer of braking torque [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angoulême / FR | [2009/31] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angouleme / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carriot, Pascal 14 rue des Tulipes Le Mas 16400 La Couronne / FR | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291596.7 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | FR20030008362 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0308362 | [2005/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496601 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496601 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/102 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F16D65/46 (EP,US);
B66D5/14 (EP,US);
B66D5/30 (EP,US);
H02K7/1025 (EP,US);
F16D2121/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Bremssystem mit sicherer Drehmomentaufnahme | [2005/02] | English: | Braking system with secured transfer of braking torque | [2005/02] | French: | Système de freinage à reprise de couple sécurisée | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000035064 ; | [X]DE1292735 (SUEDDEUTSCHE ELEKTROMOTOREN WE) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2037238 (BAUMUELLER GMBH A [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 17 - page 10, line 25; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0298403 (RIXEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 6-10 * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 43; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000035064 A 20000202 (TABUCHI TEC KK) [A] 2 * abstract * |