EP1510480 - Alignment device for a mail handling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2006/17] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gregoire, Jean-Pierre 2, allée du Tremblay 77170 Brie Comte Robert / FR | 02 /
Multignier, Alain 23, rue des Ecoles 93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | 03 /
Rackwitz, Roman 11, rue Bailleul 75001 Paris / FR | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292077.7 | 24.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | FR20030010125 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0310125 | [2005/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510480 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510480 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/06, B65H3/66 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B65H3/66 (EP);
B65H1/06 (EP);
B65H2301/22 (EP);
B65H2301/3613 (EP);
B65H2301/362 (EP);
B65H2301/363 (EP);
B65H2404/7414 (EP);
B65H2405/111 (EP);
B65H2511/12 (EP);
B65H2701/1916 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ausrichteinrichtung für ein Postbearbeitungssystem | [2005/09] | English: | Alignment device for a mail handling system | [2005/09] | French: | Dispositif anti-biais pour machine de traitement de courrier | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6012427 ; | [A]US3356364 (HELMUT GRIGEREIT); | [A]EP0590285 (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]); | [A]US6523822 (GALTIER OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850604), vol. 009, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 384), & JP60012427 A 19850122 (CANON KK) [A] * abstract * |