Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
05.02.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2013 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.07.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.03.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
05.11.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.11.2011 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.11.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.07.2011 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.07.2011 | First examination report | |
08.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.08.2010 | Change - applicant | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
06.08.2010 | Change - representative | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
07.11.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.11.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |
25.11.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
25.03.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] |