EP1535947 - Diorganosiloxane derivatives containing a 4,4-diarylbutadiene moiety, sunscreen compositions containing them and their uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Hervé 31, Rue Robert Schumann 93420 Villepinte / FR | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292615.4 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | FR20030050900 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0350900 | [2005/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535947 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535947 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/04, C07F7/08, A61K8/89 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
C08G77/045 (EP);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61K8/895 (EP);
A61K8/898 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
C07F7/0838 (EP);
C07F7/21 (EP);
C08G77/04 (EP);
A61K2800/52 (EP);
A61K2800/57 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | C08G77/04, C07F7/08, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | 4,4-Diarylbutadien enthaltende Diorganopolysiloxan-Derivate, diese enthaltende Lichtschutzzusammensetzungen und deren Verwendungen | [2005/22] | English: | Diorganosiloxane derivatives containing a 4,4-diarylbutadiene moiety, sunscreen compositions containing them and their uses | [2005/22] | French: | Composés diorganopolysiloxaniques à fonction 4,4-diarylbutadiène compositions photoprotectrices les contenant ; utilisations | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 30.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.01.2010 | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | PL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
CY | 06.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
PL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 06.01.2010 | |
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002053527 ; | [Y]EP0712855 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * Revendications 1-30; formules (1)-(2), (4.1)-(4.4); exemples 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0845466 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * Revendications 1-16; formules (1) et (2); exemples 1-3 *; | [X]WO03027168 (SILVER MICHAEL E [US]) [X] 1-21 * Revendication 1; formule (I); définition de X * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002053527 A 20020219 (TAKASAGO INTERNATL CORP) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0712855 | EP0845466 | JP2002053527 | WO03027168 |