Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7439380 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2008 | B2 | US2007213548 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | US79802607 | 09.05.2007 | US99522604 | 24.11.2004 | US52698703 | 05.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7229610 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2007 | B2 | US2005129636 | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | US99522604 | 24.11.2004 | US52698703 | 05.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4467003B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | B2 | JP2005213245 | 11.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1535947 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2010 | B1 | EP1535947 | 01.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE454417T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004024950D1 | 25.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2338323T | 06.05.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2862641 | 03.03.2006 | B1 | FR2862641 | 27.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0350900 | 25.11.2003 |