EP1529514 - Make-up composition comprising a particulate material enclosing colored inorganic pigments and inorganic pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumousseaux, Christophe, c/o Nihon L'Oreal K.K. KSP R&D-B1113 2-1 Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi 213-0012 Kanagawa / JP | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P., et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Le Coupanec, Pascale, et al Nony & Associés, 3 rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292634.5 | 05.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | JP20030378103 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003378103 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529514 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/02 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Make-up-Zusammensetzung enthaltend partikelförmiges Material umfassend anorganische Farbpigmente und anorganische Pigmente | [2005/19] | English: | Make-up composition comprising a particulate material enclosing colored inorganic pigments and inorganic pigments | [2005/19] | French: | Composition de maquillage contenant un materiau particulaire contenant pigments inorganiques colorés et pigments inorganiques | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 04.01.2007 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6067407 ; | [DY]JP2001354776 ; | [A]JPS6368513 ; | [Y]EP0445785 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 11 - line 16 * * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 7, line 25 - line 39 * * tables * * examples *; | [A]EP0612516 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al); | [Y]EP1036799 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0027] , [0085] , [0086] , [0138] , [0139] * * example 34 * * claims 20,21 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850813), vol. 009, no. 196, Database accession no. (C - 297), & JP60067407 A 19850417 (POLA KASEI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001354776 A 20011225 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [DY] 1-13 * abstract * | [DY] - EMMERT R, "Quantification of the soft focus effect", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, WHEATON, IL, US, (199607), vol. 111, no. 7, ISSN 0361-4387, pages 57 - 61, XP009029669 [DY] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880815), vol. 012, no. 299, Database accession no. (C - 520), & JP63068513 A 19880328 (HOSOKAWA MICRON KK) [A] * abstract * | Examination | JP2000309503 | - ISHIHARA S, "Novel Colored Complex Cellulose Beads", IFSCC INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20020923), vol. 22, pages 1 - 6, XP003004333 | other | JP2000309503K | JP2000309503 | - ISHIHARA S., "Novel Colored Complex Cellulose Beads", 22ND IFSCC CONGRESS, SCIENTIFIC PROGRAMME, COSMETIC SCIENCE FOR A GLOBAL MARKETPLACE, EDINBURGH, (2002), vol. 22, page 6 PG-S, XP003004333 |