EP1533755 - Printing method for a compact franking machine and associated franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2006/17] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krasuski, Marek 17, rue du Maréchal Galliéni 92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 02 /
Fajour, Michel 38, rue des Pierrelais 92320 Chatillon / FR | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292729.3 | 18.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | FR20030013573 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0313573 | [2005/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533755 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533755 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G01G19/4148 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0037 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00685 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckverfahren für eine kompakte Frankiermaschine und zugehörige Frankiermaschine | [2005/21] | English: | Printing method for a compact franking machine and associated franking machine | [2005/21] | French: | Procédé d'impression pour machine à affranchir compacte et machine à affranchir associée | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
03.12.2020
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
03.12.2020
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
07.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg & Partner Patentanwälte (GbR) Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
07.02.2012
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Eckert, Lars Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn Landskorn, Eckert Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstraße 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Eckert, Lars Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn Landskorn, Eckert Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstraße 31 D-81679 München / DE | 14.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.08.2012 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2013 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2021 | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 28.12.2020 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2021/17] | 09.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 16.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T1135/15 | 11.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.02.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 19.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2235656 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB]) [A] 4* page 5, lines 1-10; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5831220 (RAMSDEN GARY W [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 16, lines 12-14 * * column 17, lines 26-37 * * column 21, lines 4-17; figures 13,14,18a *; | [A]EP0944028 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0023]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1189041 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US2003204477 (MCNETT JOHN C [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0026] * * abstract * [A] 1-3 |