EP1550656 - fused 4-5-diamino-n,n-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one derivatives for use in composition for dyeing keratin fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/27] | 4-5-diamino-n,n-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one derivatives for use in composition for dyeing keratin fibres | ||
[2009/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vidal, Laurent 7, Rue de Rungis 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Fadli, Aziz 5, Allée des Maraichers 77500 Chelles / FR | [2009/19] |
Former [2005/27] | 01 /
Vidal, Laurent 7, rue de Rungis 75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Fadli, Aziz 5, allée des Maraichers 77500 Chelles / FR | Representative(s) | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Fevrier, Murielle L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292749.1 | 22.11.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | FR20030050950 | 01.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0350950 | FR20040050297 | 18.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0450297 | [2005/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550656 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550656 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K8/49, A61Q5/10 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/49 (KR);
A61K8/494 (EP,BR,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,BR,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | C07D231/54, C07D487/04, A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Kondensierte 4-5-diamino-N,N-dihydro-pyrazol-3-on-Derivate und deren Verwendung als Färbemittel für keratinfasern | [2009/08] | English: | fused 4-5-diamino-n,n-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one derivatives for use in composition for dyeing keratin fibres | [2009/08] | French: | Dérivés de 4-5-diamino-N,N-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one condensé, utilisés pour la teinture des fibres keratiniques | [2009/08] |
Former [2005/27] | 4-5-diamino-N,N-dihydro-pyrazol-3-on-Derivate und deren Verwendung als Färbemittel für Keratinfasern | ||
Former [2005/27] | 4-5-diamino-n,n-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one derivatives for use in composition for dyeing keratin fibres | ||
Former [2005/27] | Dérivés de 4-5-diamino-N,N-dihydro-pyrazol-3-one utilisés pour la teinture des fibres keratiniques | Examination procedure | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 26.10.2005 | Request for decision received: Priority | 29.12.2005 | Result of request for decision (Priority): Request accepted | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06122216.2 / EP1764082 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IE | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | IS | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | LU | 22.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3012884 (DE RAMAIX MAURICE ANTOINE, et al) [A] 24-38 * compound (12) col.6; column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 3 *; | [A]CH421343 (SANDOZ AG [CH]) [A] 24 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1959009 (WOLFEN FILMFAB VEB) [A] 24,37 * page 4, lines 13-17 *; | [A]US4128425 (GREENWALD RICHARD B) [A] 25-38 * column 3; compound (5) *; | [A]US4886736 (NAKAMURA KOKI [JP], et al) [A] 24* composés (C-87)-C(91), colonne 91-94 *; | [Y]EP0873745 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 2, lines 15,16 *; | [Y]EP1250909 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 2, lines 18,24-27 * |