EP1541970 - Method for compensating anisotropy in a vibrating bell inertial rotation sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem Défense Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/06] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Sagem SA Le Ponant de Paris, 27 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caron, Jean-Michel 6b avenue Mathilde 95210 Saint-Gratien / FR | 02 /
Ragot, Vincent 14 rue Strasbourg 92600 Asnieres / FR | 03 /
Renault, Alain 51 Chemin du Chou 95300 Pontoise / FR | 04 /
Jeanroy, Alain 9b rue des Hautes Rayes 78700 Conflans Saint-Honorine / FR | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/24] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292888.7 | 06.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | FR20030014514 | 11.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314514 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541970 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541970 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01C25/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01C19/5691 (EP,US);
G01C25/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kompensation einer Anisotropie in einem Inertialdrehwinkelsensor mit einer schwingenden Glocke | [2005/24] | English: | Method for compensating anisotropy in a vibrating bell inertial rotation sensor | [2005/24] | French: | Procédé de compensation d'une anisotropie dans un capteur de rotation inertiel à cloche vibrante | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | PL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | LU | 06.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
LU | 06.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
LU | 06.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
LU | 06.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2784180 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2821422 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * |