EP1542321 - Electrical device having two coupling parts with keying means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Araujo, Fernando 10, rue des Jonques 87350 Panazol / FR | 02 /
Rouffanche, Martial 2 Allée des Cerisiers 87220 Boisseuil / FR | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2005/24] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04292914.1 | 08.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | FR20030014497 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314497 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542321 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542321 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/645 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01R13/6453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Elektrische Vorrichtung mit zwei zu verbindenen Kupplungsteilen mit Verschlüsselungseinrichtung | [2011/30] | English: | Electrical device having two coupling parts with keying means | [2005/24] | French: | Appareil électrique en deux portions emboîtables comportant des moyens de détrompage | [2005/24] |
Former [2005/24] | Elektrische Vorrichtung mit zwei zu verbindenen Kupplungsteilen mit Verschusselungseinrichtung | Examination procedure | 20.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 05.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HU | 07.12.2011 | IE | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | LU | 08.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GB | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 08.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GB | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 08.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GB | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 08.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GB | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GB | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GB | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1066672 (NORTHROP CORP); | [A]US4159862 (FUNCK GORDON W, et al); | [A]US6302745 (LANDIS JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 46 * |