EP1479565 - Console for a vehicle interior [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feyel, Marie-Claire 86, Avenue de Paris 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Panhelleux, Jérôme 111, Rue des Morillons 75015 Paris / FR | [2004/48] | Application number, filing date | 04300287.2 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | FR20030006262 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0306262 | [2004/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479565 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479565 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/04, B60R11/00, B60R16/02, H02G11/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H02G11/00 (EP);
B60N2/773 (EP);
B60N2/793 (EP);
B60R7/04 (EP);
B60R2011/0007 (EP);
B60R2011/0029 (EP);
B60R2011/0084 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Konsole für einen Fahrzeuginnenraum | [2004/48] | English: | Console for a vehicle interior | [2004/48] | French: | Console pour habitacle de véhicule | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | IE | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | PL | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CY | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 26.07.2006 | |
PL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS62194955 ; | [Y]US3646282 (HERRING JAMES M JR) [Y] 1,2,10-15 * column 1, line 4 - line 15 * * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 16; figure - *; | [Y]FR2822770 (SAI AUTOMOTIVE ALLIBERT IND [FR]) [Y] 1,2,10-15 * the whole document * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880206), vol. 012, no. 041, Database accession no. (M - 666), & JP62194955 A 19870827 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * |