EP1508469 - Passenger compartment arrangement of an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nefa, Patricio 4, rue du Port 78400 Chatou / FR | [2005/08] | Application number, filing date | 04300541.2 | 16.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | FR20030010039 | 20.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0310039 | [2005/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508469 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/34, B60N2/30 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B60N2/3013 (EP);
B60N2/3031 (EP);
B60N2/305 (EP);
B60N2/34 (EP);
B60N2/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeuginnenraum-Anordnung | [2005/08] | English: | Passenger compartment arrangement of an automotive vehicle | [2005/08] | French: | Agencement d'habitacle de véhicule automobile | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/47] | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003220868 ; | [A]US4200329 (INAMI FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9,10 * abstract * * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 41; figure 12 *; | [AD]FR2604958 (RENAULT [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract ** page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 10; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]DE4411183 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 7; figures 1a-1c *; | [A]GB2336772 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1,5-8 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]WO03018353 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * abstract * * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 22; figures 1a,1b,3a-3c * [A] 6,8-10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003220868 A 20030805 (TAKASHIMAYA NIPPATSU KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1,5-8 * abstract * |