17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
26.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
11.01.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
02.02.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
19.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.03.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
23.09.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
21.09.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |