EP1557118 - Shelf arrangement with integrated power supply for illumination devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C/S FRANCE 1 rue de la Cressonière 27950 Saint Marcel / FR | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states WATTOHM TECHNOLOGIES 15 Avenue Eugène Gazeau 60300 Senlis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villeneuve, Daniel Rue des Fours à Chaux 60300 Senlis / FR | 02 /
Carlin, Patrick 305 Avenue Saint-Philippe Rés. du Golf - Bat A 06410 Biot / FR | 03 /
Luguet, Philippe 1 Allée d'Abbecourt 78630 Orgeval / FR | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04356200.8 | 20.12.2004 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | FR20040000486 | 20.01.2004 Original published format: FR 0400486 | [2005/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557118 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/08 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
A47F5/0018 (EP,US);
A47F11/10 (EP,US);
A47F5/0846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/16] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regalvorrichtung mit integrierter Spannungsversorgung für Beleuchtungsvorrichtungen | [2005/30] | English: | Shelf arrangement with integrated power supply for illumination devices | [2005/30] | French: | Dispositif de rayonnage avec moyens intégrés d'alimentation électrique pour appareils d'éclairage | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 28.01.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20111800U (LORENTZEN UWE JENS [DE]) [X] 1-3* page 7, line 24 - page 11, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO03079852 (JR ARK OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 4 - page 9, line 25; figures 1-14 * |