EP1612889 - Terminal with leaf spring for reduced insertion force [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAGER ELECTRO S.A. 132 Boulevard d'Europe F-67210 Obernai / FR | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Measson, Ghislain 8, rue du Général Leclerc 67210 Obernai / FR | 02 /
Helfter, Marc 12, rue des Bateliers 67114 Eschau / FR | 03 /
Dietrich, Christian 4, rue du Vignoble 67140 Gertwiller / FR | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 04360061.8 | 30.06.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612889 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612889 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R13/193 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/34 (EP);
H01R4/485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Blattfederanschlussklemme mit reduzierter Einsteckkraft | [2006/01] | English: | Terminal with leaf spring for reduced insertion force | [2006/01] | French: | Borne à lame ressort à effort d'enfichage atténué | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Request for further processing for: | 06.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 06.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.01.2008 | CZ | 30.01.2008 | DK | 30.01.2008 | EE | 30.01.2008 | FI | 30.01.2008 | IE | 30.01.2008 | PL | 30.01.2008 | RO | 30.01.2008 | SI | 30.01.2008 | SK | 30.01.2008 | TR | 30.01.2008 | BG | 30.04.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | GR | 01.05.2008 | ES | 11.05.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | LU | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 30.06.2008 | HU | 31.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 30.01.2008 | |
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
TR | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 30.01.2008 | |
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 30.01.2008 | |
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 30.01.2008 | |
CZ | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 30.01.2008 | |
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
BG | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 30.01.2008 | |
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
EE | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 30.01.2008 | |
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 30.01.2008 | |
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 30.01.2008 | |
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
RO | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SK | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 30.01.2008 | |
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 30.01.2008 | |
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 30.01.2008 | |
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 30.01.2008 | |
PL | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 30.01.2008 | |
ES | 11.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002151220 ; | [X]EP0687033 (WHITAKER CORP [US]); | [A]DE19825629 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |